GA HB120 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from state sales and use tax, so as to provide for an exemption with respect to the sale of certain school supplies, clothing, footwear, computers, and computer related accessories for a limited period of time; to provide for an exemption from sales and use tax with respect to certain sales of certain energy efficient products for a limited period of time; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax exemption; certain school supplies; energy efficient products; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Buddy Harden [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Willie Talton [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #353 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House Vote #69 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House Vote #69 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 117 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-24 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-16 | House First Readers |