GA HB1230 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating and establishing the Recorder's Court of DeKalb County, approved March 17, 1959 (Ga. L. 1959, p. 3093), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 11, 1979 (Ga. L. 1979, p. 3565), so as to provide for the payment of costs in such court; to provide for a schedule of costs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County Recorder's Court; payment of costs in such court; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #707 - Local Calendar (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #707 - Local Calendar (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 476 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers |