GA HB1297 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a nonbinding, advisory referendum by the electors of Jeff Davis County for the purpose of ascertaining whether the judge of the Probate Court of Jeff Davis County shall also serve as the chief magistrate judge of the Magistrate Court of Jeff Davis County; to provide for procedures and requirements relating thereto; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jeff Davis County; nonbinding, advisory referendum by electors to ascertain if judge of Probate Court will also serve as chief magistrate judge; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Chuck Sims [R] | Rep. Tommy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 553 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House First Readers |