GA HB131 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting and supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to provide for the disbursement of proceeds from the sale of a special license plate for the Georgia Aquarium; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Georgia Aquarium; provide for disbursement of proceeds from the sale of plates
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54529 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180278 |