GA HB1339 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Act 384
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Act 384
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to revise relative to certificate of need; to amend Code Section 48-7-29.20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax credits for contributions to rural hospital organizations, so as to increase the aggregate limit for tax credits for contributions to rural hospital organizations; to extend the sunset provision; to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to provide for the creation of the Comprehensive Health Coverage Commission; to provide for its members; to provide for its purpose and duties; to provide for assistance from experts and consultants; to provide for semiannual reports; to provide for the automatic repeal of the commission; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; certificate of need; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. James Beverly [D] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Danny Mathis [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #741 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #742 (Y: 95 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #664 (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #660 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider: Senate Vote #659 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #658 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #575 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #742 (Y: 95 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #664 (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #660 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider: Senate Vote #659 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1192, Hb 1339: Senate Vote #658 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #575 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Act 384 | |
2024-04-19 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-21 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |