GA HB1374 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reincorporate and provide a new charter for the City of Acworth, approved February 17, 1989 (Ga. L. 1989, p. 3512), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 1, 2023 (Ga. L. 2023, p. 4052), so as to adopt by reference a certain map; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Acworth, City of; adopt by reference a certain map
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #688 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #665 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #665 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Hopper |