GA HB1393 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations upon the authority of local governments to levy sales and use taxes and other similar taxes, so as to provide for an exemption to the total local sales and use tax cap otherwise applicable; to provide such exemption for a certain tax levied for purposes of a metropolitan area system of public transportation which is first levied after January 1, 2010; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purpses.
Title
Sales and use tax; cap exemption; metropolitan public transportation purposes; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Roberta Abdul-Salaam [D] | Rep. Tyrone Brooks [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] | Rep. Georganna Sinkfield [D] | Rep. Willie Talton [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #860 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 607 | |
2010-06-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-16 | House First Readers |