GA HB1429 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Cartersville to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cartersville, City of; levy excise tax; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 653 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House First Readers |