GA HB1444 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a supplemental salary for the judges of the Superior Court of the Coweta Judicial Circuit, approved December 11, 1953 (Ga. L. 1953, Nov.-Dec. Sess., p. 92), as amended, so as to change the supplemental salaries for such judges; to provide for the apportionment of such supplements among the counties in the circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coweta Judicial Circuit; Superior Court; change supplemental salaries for judges
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #609 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #609 (Y: 147 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #609 (Y: 147 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 658 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Hopper |