GA HB1447 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Statham, Georgia; to repeal all prior charters for the City of Statham, Georgia, and enactments, local legislation or home rule amendments relating thereto made prior to the effective date of this enactment; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Statham, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #688 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #674 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #674 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House Hopper |