GA HB1455 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating the City of Marietta, approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 3541), as amended, so as to modify provisions relating to the meetings of the city council; to provide for agenda work sessions; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Marietta, City of; city council meetings; modify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Patricia Dooley [D] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Robert Teilhet [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-28 | Act 518 | |
2010-05-28 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House First Readers |