GA HB1470 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of Henry County to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Henry County; levy excise tax; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Baker [D] | Rep. John Lunsford [R] | Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #723 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 665 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers |