GA HB1474 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Atlanta, approved April 15, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 4469), as amended, so as to change the corporate limits of such municipality; to provide a contingent effective date and automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Atlanta, City of; change corporate limits
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Lupton [D] | Rep. Betsy Holland [D] | Rep. Tanya Miller [D] | Rep. Inga Willis [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Phil Olaleye [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #716 (Y: 163 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68801 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/227095 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68801#24313 |