GA HB226 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to require the Department of Community Health to submit a Section 1115 waiver request to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a demonstration project to provide treatment services under Medicaid to persons in this state living with HIV; to provide for implementation upon approval; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social services; treatment services under Medicaid to persons with HIV; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Solomon Adesanya [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-22 | House | House Postponed |
2023-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hopper |