GA HB232 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 28-7-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the prohibition of contingency compensation of lobbyists, so as to provide that such prohibition shall not apply to bona fide commission salespersons and that such salespersons shall not be required to register as lobbyists or otherwise be considered to be lobbyists; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lobbyists; commission salesperson not required; prohibition not apply
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Rep. Keith Heard [D] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Roger Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #162 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #113 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 - Motion To Engross (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Vote #46 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #113 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 - Motion To Engross (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Vote #46 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Effective Date | |
2011-03-15 | Act 4 | |
2011-03-15 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-03-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Engrossed | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-10 | House First Readers |