GA HB284 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that future elections for the office of chief judge of the Magistrate Court of Cobb County shall be nonpartisan elections; to provide for the sitting chief judge of the magistrate court to serve out his or her term of office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Magistrate Court chief judge; provide nonpartisan elections
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] |
Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #218 (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Vote #74 (Y: 95 N: 69 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Vote #74 (Y: 95 N: 69 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 10 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |