GA HB29 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to provide for applicability of Chapter 16, the "Tax Amnesty Program Act," and Chapter 16A, the "Property Tax Amnesty Program Act," to additional amnesty periods; to provide for additional waiver periods; to provide for new duration and applicability periods; to change certain provisions regarding collection costs; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tax Amnesty Program Act; additional amnesty periods; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House Vote #50 - Passage (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-24 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-12 | House First Readers | |
2010-12-07 | House Prefiled |