GA HB292 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Internal Revenue Code; define terms; incorporate certain provisions of federal law into Georgia law
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #136 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #72 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Vote #44 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #72 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Vote #44 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Effective Date | |
2015-03-06 | Act 6 | |
2015-03-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-03-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-05 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hopper |