GA HB319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to habeas corpus procedure for persons under sentence of state court of record, so as to increase the maximum amount which counties may be reimbursed for certain habeas corpus costs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Habeas corpus; maximum amount counties may be reimbursed for certain costs; increase
Sponsors
Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #219 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Vote #130 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Vote #130 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 216 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |