GA HB333 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 9 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions pertaining to the Georgia Building Authority, so as to exempt the authority from certain sales and use tax; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Building Authority; exempt from certain sales and use tax; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #764 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 - Motion To Engross Hb 333, Hb 963, Hb 1060,hb 1191,hb 1192,hb 1198,hb 1221 (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House Vote #166 - Pass (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 - Motion To Engross Hb 333, Hb 963, Hb 1060,hb 1191,hb 1192,hb 1198,hb 1221 (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House Vote #166 - Pass (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 425 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-09 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |