GA HB346 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency medical services personnel, so as to authorize the administration of hydrocortisone sodium succinate to patients with congenital adrenal hyperplasia under certain conditions; to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements; to provide for immunity; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jarom's Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #387 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #266 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #200 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #266 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #200 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 146 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Hopper |