GA HB353 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., the "Georgia Lottery for Education Act," so as to provide that administrative procedures and actions regarding bona fide coin operated amusement machines shall be subject to Chapter 13 of Title 50; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Lottery for Education Act; administrative procedures regarding coin operated amusement machines shall be subject to Chapter 13 of Title 50; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Adoption Of Amend #1a By Sen From The 45th To Amend #1 By Sen From The 4th: Senate Vote #791 (Y: 24 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-26 - House - Agree To Senate Amendment: House Vote #806 (Y: 148 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute As Amended By Amendment #1: Senate Vote #794 (Y: 29 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider The Loss Of The Motion To Agree As Amended: Senate Vote #793 (Y: 28 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute As Amended By Amendment #1: Senate Vote #792 (Y: 27 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #738 (Y: 142 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #393 (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 45th: Senate Vote #392 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 26th: Senate Vote #391 (Y: 24 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 46th: Senate Vote #390 (Y: 25 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #214 (Y: 127 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Agree To Senate Amendment: House Vote #806 (Y: 148 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute As Amended By Amendment #1: Senate Vote #794 (Y: 29 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider The Loss Of The Motion To Agree As Amended: Senate Vote #793 (Y: 28 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute As Amended By Amendment #1: Senate Vote #792 (Y: 27 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #738 (Y: 142 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #393 (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 45th: Senate Vote #392 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 26th: Senate Vote #391 (Y: 24 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 46th: Senate Vote #390 (Y: 25 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #214 (Y: 127 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2024-03-21 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hopper |