GA HB365 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem taxes on motor vehicles, so as to lower the tax rate imposed; to revise a definition; to revise the date range for antique motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; lower tax rate imposed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #421 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #431 (Y: 147 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-04-02SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-29SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback