GA HB382 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6A of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to outdoor stewardship, so as to redefine eligible applicants for and recipients of the grants; to provide for up to 5 percent of trust moneys for state administrative costs; to provide for annual reporting of program administration expenditures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Outdoor stewardship; eligible applicants for and recipients of grants; redefine
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #381 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #287 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #187 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #287 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #187 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 222 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |