GA HB446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-40.36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income tax credits for timber producers incurring losses from Hurricane Michael, so as to clarify that certain income tax credits that have been transferred shall not be refundable to the transferee and shall not be eligible for transfer; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; timber producers incurring losses from Hurricane Michael; clarify that certain credits that have been transferred shall not be refundable
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #383 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #278 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #155 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #278 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #155 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-18 | Act 32 | |
2019-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hopper |