GA HB456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 81 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government budgets and audits, so as to increase the expenditure amount for which a local government may elect an annual report in lieu of a biennial audit; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; elect an annual report in lieu of a biennial audit; increase expenditure amount
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #334 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #130 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #130 (Y: 163 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 211 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hopper |