GA HB46 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to securing attendance of witnesses and production and preservation of evidence, so as to repeal the "Uniform Foreign Depositions Act" and to replace such Act with the "Uniform Interstate Depositions and Discovery Act"; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for issuance and service of subpoenas; to provide for depositions and production and inspection of documents and tangible evidence; to provide for protective orders; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform Interstate Depositions and Discovery Act; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Roger Lane [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #424 - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #359 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #251 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Vote #32 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Vote #22 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #359 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #251 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Vote #32 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Vote #22 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 643 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-01-23 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-15 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers |