GA HB495 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to probate courts, so as to provide for the appointment, compensation, term, authority, qualifications, training, and limitations of associate probate court judges; to provide for the filling of vacancies in the office of judge of the probate court; to provide for the qualifications of certain judges of the probate court; to provide for the jurisdiction of judges of the probate court; to update language regarding conservators and guardians; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 6 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to relations between principal and agent, so as to update language regarding conservators and guardians; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probate courts; associate probate court judges; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #372 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #290 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #208 - Pass (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #290 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #208 - Pass (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-05 | Act 177 | |
2009-05-05 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-19 | House First Readers |