GA HB502 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Georgia Cosmetic Laser Services Act," so as to revise a definition; to revise a provision relating to requirements for applicants for assistant laser practitioner licenses; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Cosmetic Laser Services Act; revise a definition; revise a provision
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #674 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #409 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #409 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Act 393 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-21 | House | House Hopper |