GA HB511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 32, 36, 45, 48, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to highways, bridges, and ferries; local government; to repeal and reserve Chapter 32 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Regional Transportation Authority; to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to correct a cross-reference; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 32 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the State Road and Tollway Authority, so as to redesignate Code sections relative to such authority to a new chapter and make conforming changes to reflect such transfer; to amend the O.C.G.A., so as to make conforming and cross-reference changes relating to such redesignation and transfer; to reserve Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 32 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the State Road and Tollway Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highways, bridges, and ferries; funding sources and a consolidated state entity for the planning and implementation of mobility and transit services; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #186 (Y: 159 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback