GA HB514 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Conference Committee Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Conference Committee Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia, relating to general provisions regarding the judicial system, so as to provide for provisions regarding the assignment of senior judges; to provide for certain provisions regarding a senior judge's status; to change certain provisions relating to certain courts requesting assistance of a senior judge; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Judicial system; assignment of senior judges; provide for provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Burkalter [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] |
Rep. Kevin Levitas [D] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #519 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 165 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #518 - Suspend One Hour Rule (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #485 - Recon Agree Sen Sub (Y: 109 N: 49 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #484 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 128 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #409 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #136 - Pass (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #518 - Suspend One Hour Rule (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #485 - Recon Agree Sen Sub (Y: 109 N: 49 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #484 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 128 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #409 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #136 - Pass (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Insists | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Insists | |
2009-04-03 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-03 | House Reconsidered | |
2009-04-03 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Tabled | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-25 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House First Readers |