GA HB542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the care and protection of indigent and elderly patients, so as to authorize health care facilities to purchase and sell charity care credits through an exchange to meet their indigent and charity care requirements; to provide for definitions; to provide for the creation of the Georgia Charity Care Exchange; to provide for contractual arrangements between health care facilities for the first two years; to provide for an annual report; to provide for creation of an oversight board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; heath care facilities to purchase and sell charity care credits through an exchange to meet their indigent and charity care requirements; authorize

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback