GA HB642 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 6, 12, 45, and 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating respectively to aviation, conservation and natural resources, public officers and employees, and state government, so as to provide for an extensive revision of the structure and functions of certain executive branch agencies; to create the Georgia Services Administration as a successor agency to the Department of Administrative Services; to amend numerous provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to make conforming amendments and correct cross references; to repeal specific laws; to provide for other related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Services Administration; create; revise several Titles
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #624 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Vote #468 - Passage (Y: 134 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Vote #468 - Passage (Y: 134 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 630 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-14 | House Second Readers | |
2011-04-12 | House First Readers |