GA HB651 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-1-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration of sexual offenders, so as to revise certain provisions relating to information provided by the Department of Education to schools on accessing the registry; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sexual offenders; information to schools on accessing registry; revise certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Eugene Maddox [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #747 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Vote #541 - Pass (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Vote #541 - Pass (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 388 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-01 | House Third Readers | |
2010-01-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-04 | House First Readers |