GA HB651 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to provide for the election of members of the board of education of Paulding County," approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2381), as amended, so as to change the method of filling vacancies on the board of education; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Paulding County; board of education; change method of filling vacancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #265 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Vote #305 (Y: 131 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Vote #305 (Y: 131 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V9 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Hopper |