GA HB676 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 29 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to information technology, so as to provide for the submission of business cases in certain circumstances; to provide for change management requirements for certain projects; to provide for legislative intent and findings; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Accountability, Change Management, and Process Improvement Act of 2015"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #817 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #596 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Vote #563 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #596 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Vote #563 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 430 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House Hopper |