GA HB704 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL To be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of Milton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved March 29, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3554), as amended, so as to modify provisions related to the compensation of the mayor and councilmembers; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Milton, City of; mayor and councilmembers; modify provisions related to compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #253 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #235 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #235 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-06-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 188 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-08 | House | House Hopper |