GA HB735 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Stewart County Water and Sewerage Authority, approved March 24, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 4498), so as to revise method of membership appointments; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Stewart County Water and Sewerage Authority; membership appointments; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 435 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |