GA HB750 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 7-1-1001 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from licensing requirements of mortgage brokers and mortgage lenders, so as to provide for an exemption to mortgage loan originator licensing requirements for employees of certain nonprofit corporations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Banking and finance; exemption to mortgage loan originator licensing requirements for employees of certain nonprofit corporations; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #629 (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #651 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #651 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 571 | |
2014-04-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-15 | House | House Hopper |