GA HB781 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to financial institutions, so as to clarify and remove superfluous language; to reduce the number of days for certain cease and desist orders to become final; to repeal Code Section 7-1-1003.1, relating to physical place of business; to eliminate the notification requirement for a change in ultimate equitable owner of mortgage brokers or mortgage lenders; to change advertising content requirements for mortgage lenders and mortgage brokers; to reduce the number of days for the process related to bond cancellation notice; to amend Chapter 6A of Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Fair Lending Act, so as to update citations to federal regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Financial institutions; clarify and remove superfluous language; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Gloria Frazier [D] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #736 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #641 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #456 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #641 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #456 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 492 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Hopper |