GA HB785 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide for limitations on licensure requirements for certain health care providers; to prohibit the conditioning of certain licensing for health care providers on the participation in health insurance plans and other activities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; limitations on licensure requirements for certain health care providers; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #665 - Passage (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Vote #483 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Vote #483 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-19 | Act 614 | |
2012-04-19 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-15 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-24 | House First Readers |