GA HB816 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state administrative organization of the Department of Revenue, so as to provide for mandatory fingerprinting and criminal record checks for certain individuals; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue, Department of; mandatory fingerprinting and criminal record checks for certain individuals; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #601 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #526 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #526 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 345 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |