GA HB818 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 38 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Compact for a Balanced Budget, so as to extend the sunset provision of the compact; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compact for a Balanced Budget; extend sunset provision

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2020-01-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback