GA HB867 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners of roads and revenue in and for the County of Polk, approved August 19, 1919 (Ga. L. 1919, p. 719), as amended, so as to revise the place of meeting for the board; to provide for employment of a clerk by the board; to provide for public access to minutes; to provide for continuous service of the county attorney subject to the will of the board; to authorize the board to institute policies and procedures for requisition of supplies and payment of obligations; to require the board to provide certain financial statements upon request by the grand jury; to repeal an obsolete section; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Polk County; board of commissioners of roads and revenue; revise place of board meeting; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #564 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Vote #473 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Vote #473 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 375 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-27 | House | House Hopper |