GA HB885 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the use of cannabis for treatment of cancer and glaucoma, so as to provide for continuing research into the benefits of medical cannabis to treat certain conditions; to provide for the continuation of the Controlled Substances Therapeutic Research Program; to provide for selection of academic medical centers to conduct the research; to provide for expansion of the review board and its duties; to establish the responsibilities of academic medical centers; to provide for the testing, storing, and dispensing by the Georgia Drugs and Narcotics Agency; to provide for immunity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medical cannabis; continuing research into benefits to treat certain conditions; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Mickey Channell [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #724 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #673 (Y: 171 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #673 (Y: 171 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House Hopper |