GA HB896 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create the Macon-Bibb County Community Enhancement Authority," approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5270), so as to change the membership of such authority; to provide for the initial term of the chairperson; to define certain terms; to include targeted employment areas within the powers of the authority; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon-Bibb County Community Enhancement Authority; change membership of authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #483 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #483 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-06 | Act 356 | |
2014-04-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-03 | House | House Hopper |