GA HB962 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of the members of the board of education for Charlton County, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 3952), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 16, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3688), so as to change provisions relating to board of education districts; to provide for members currently serving; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Charlton County; board of education; change provisions relating to districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #558 (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #558 (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 389 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-07 | House | House Hopper |