GA HR1146 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION declaring the General Assembly's position that neither the state nor its citizens are obligated to comply with the dictates of a presidentially appointed "czar"; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; citizens not obligated to comply with appointed "czar"; declare
Sponsors
Rep. Charlice Byrd [R] | Rep. John Cox [R] | Rep. Steve Davis [R] | Rep. Robert Franklin [R] |
Rep. Jeff May [R] | Rep. Bobby Reese [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-31 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-03-24 | House Postponed | |
2010-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-25 | House First Readers |