GA HR1164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the Georgia Department of Public Safety to be attentive to the needs of livestock in transport while enforcing transportation laws and providing for the existing exemptions afforded to livestock haulers; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Department of Public Safety; be attentive to the needs of livestock in transport while enforcing transportation laws; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57371 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189960 |