GA HR533 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION requesting that the Environmental Protection Division lead efforts to evaluate the appropriate deficit from natural for dissolved oxygen in the Savannah Harbor to allow for protection of aquatic species and the economic viability of the region; and for other purposes.
Title
Environmental Protection Division; evaluate oxygen in Savannah Harbor; request
Sponsors
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Rep. Burke Day [R] |
Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #362 - Adopt (Y: 93 N: 70 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-04 | House First Readers |